LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB809
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB809
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB809
Compare Versions
AB809 Chaptered September 18, 2014
AB809 Enrolled August 22, 2014
AB809 Amended August 7, 2014
AB809 Amended August 4, 2014
AB809 Amended May 19, 2014
AB809 Amended June 25, 2013
AB809 Amended April 29, 2013
AB809 Amended April 3, 2013
AB809 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB809 Chaptered September 18, 2014
AB809 Enrolled August 22, 2014
AB809 Amended August 7, 2014
AB809 Amended August 4, 2014
AB809 Amended May 19, 2014
AB809 Amended June 25, 2013
AB809 Amended April 29, 2013
AB809 Amended April 3, 2013
AB809 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare