California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB913 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Amended

Bill June 25, 2014
Bill June 3, 2014
Bill May 29, 2013
Bill April 29, 2013
Bill March 12, 2013