LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB913
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB913
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB913
Compare Versions
AB913 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB913 Amended June 25, 2014
AB913 Amended June 3, 2014
AB913 Amended May 29, 2013
AB913 Amended April 29, 2013
AB913 Amended March 12, 2013
AB913 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB913 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB913 Amended June 25, 2014
AB913 Amended June 3, 2014
AB913 Amended May 29, 2013
AB913 Amended April 29, 2013
AB913 Amended March 12, 2013
AB913 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare