|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 851, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6216.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4366.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1761.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|