LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB928
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB928
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB928
Compare Versions
AB928 Chaptered September 30, 2014
AB928 Enrolled August 22, 2014
AB928 Amended June 16, 2014
AB928 Amended April 2, 2014
AB928 Amended July 10, 2013
AB928 Amended May 14, 2013
AB928 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB928 Chaptered September 30, 2014
AB928 Enrolled August 22, 2014
AB928 Amended June 16, 2014
AB928 Amended April 2, 2014
AB928 Amended July 10, 2013
AB928 Amended May 14, 2013
AB928 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare