|
09/26/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 366, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3113.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2256.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1832.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|