LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB933
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB933
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB933
Compare Versions
AB933 Chaptered September 26, 2013
AB933 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB933 Amended September 3, 2013
AB933 Amended June 19, 2013
AB933 Amended May 15, 2013
AB933 Amended April 17, 2013
AB933 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB933 Chaptered September 26, 2013
AB933 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB933 Amended September 3, 2013
AB933 Amended June 19, 2013
AB933 Amended May 15, 2013
AB933 Amended April 17, 2013
AB933 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare