California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB939 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Amended

Bill July 8, 2013
Bill June 18, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill May 9, 2013
Bill April 29, 2013