LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB939
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB939
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB939
Compare Versions
AB939 Amended July 8, 2013
AB939 Amended June 18, 2013
AB939 Amended May 24, 2013
AB939 Amended May 9, 2013
AB939 Amended April 29, 2013
AB939 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB939 Amended July 8, 2013
AB939 Amended June 18, 2013
AB939 Amended May 24, 2013
AB939 Amended May 9, 2013
AB939 Amended April 29, 2013
AB939 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare