|
08/12/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2241.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1582.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1118.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|