California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB984 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill July 10, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 12, 2013

Amended

Bill June 18, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013