California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB988 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2014

Amended

Bill June 15, 2014
Bill May 24, 2013