LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB988
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB988
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB988
Compare Versions
AB988 Chaptered August 25, 2014
AB988 Enrolled August 13, 2014
AB988 Amended June 15, 2014
AB988 Amended May 24, 2013
AB988 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB988 Chaptered August 25, 2014
AB988 Enrolled August 13, 2014
AB988 Amended June 15, 2014
AB988 Amended May 24, 2013
AB988 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare