Senate | 06/15/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 8. Page 75.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 75.). | ||
Senate | 06/14/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 70.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 54.) | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (February 25). | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (February 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2013 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2013 | Read first time. To print. |