LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX11
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX11
Compare Versions
ABX11 Chaptered June 27, 2013
ABX11 Enrolled June 18, 2013
ABX11 Amended June 14, 2013
ABX11 Amended June 4, 2013
ABX11 Introduced January 28, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
ABX11 Chaptered June 27, 2013
ABX11 Enrolled June 18, 2013
ABX11 Amended June 14, 2013
ABX11 Amended June 4, 2013
ABX11 Introduced January 28, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare