|
05/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2013-14 First Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:55 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 98.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after April 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 56.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 40.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (February 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (February 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2013
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|