LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX12
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX12
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX12
Compare Versions
ABX12 Chaptered May 9, 2013
ABX12 Enrolled May 1, 2013
ABX12 Amended April 1, 2013
ABX12 Amended March 21, 2013
ABX12 Amended March 7, 2013
ABX12 Introduced January 29, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
ABX12 Chaptered May 9, 2013
ABX12 Enrolled May 1, 2013
ABX12 Amended April 1, 2013
ABX12 Amended March 21, 2013
ABX12 Amended March 7, 2013
ABX12 Introduced January 29, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare