LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR118
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR118
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR118
Compare Versions
ACR118 Chaptered September 11, 2014
ACR118 Enrolled September 4, 2014
ACR118 Amended August 13, 2014
ACR118 Amended June 17, 2014
ACR118 Amended May 6, 2014
ACR118 Introduced March 6, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
ACR118 Chaptered September 11, 2014
ACR118 Enrolled September 4, 2014
ACR118 Amended August 13, 2014
ACR118 Amended June 17, 2014
ACR118 Amended May 6, 2014
ACR118 Introduced March 6, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare