California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR118 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/11/2014

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 118CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 174 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 11, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 11, 2014 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 27, 2014 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 28, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 13, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 17, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 6, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Logue MARCH 6, 2014 Relative to the California Small Business Owners' Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 118, Logue. California Small Business Owners' Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 99 in Sutter County as the California Small Business Owners' Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, The month of June is celebrated as California Small Business Month, in recognition of the tremendous contributions that small businesses make to the economic strength of our nation and state; and WHEREAS, The nation's 28 million small businesses are the job creation engine of the American economy, responsible for one-half of all private sector jobs, and are the source of roughly 70 percent of all new jobs in the last decade; and WHEREAS, California is home to three and one-half million of these small businesses, accounting for 99 percent of the state's employers and 52 percent of the state's workforce, and producing more than one-half of California's gross domestic product; and WHEREAS, California is home to the most innovative and competitive businesses in the world, placing the state consistently among the top 10 economies in the world; and WHEREAS, California's small businesses are critical to the economic health of the state because small businesses are innovative forces in the marketplace and are among the most likely to take risks to create new technologies and industries; and WHEREAS, A commitment to small businesses and support for small-scale private-sector job creators are among the most promising strategies to enhance California's human capital, expand job opportunities, and increase the state's competitive advantage in the global marketplace; and WHEREAS, It is appropriate to recognize the important role of small businesses in California's economy by dedicating a portion of State Route Highway 99 as the California Small Business Owners' Highway; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 99 between Hull Road and Stewart Road in Sutter County as the California Small Business Owners' Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.