Assembly | 06/16/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2014 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5441.). | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2014 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2014 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3758.) | ||
Senate | 06/04/2014 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2014 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5026.) | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2014 | Amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2014 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2014 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2014 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2014 | Introduced. To print. |