LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR128
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR128
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR128
Compare Versions
ACR128 Chaptered June 16, 2014
ACR128 Enrolled June 11, 2014
ACR128 Amended May 22, 2014
ACR128 Amended May 13, 2014
ACR128 Introduced April 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
ACR128 Chaptered June 16, 2014
ACR128 Enrolled June 11, 2014
ACR128 Amended May 22, 2014
ACR128 Amended May 13, 2014
ACR128 Introduced April 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare