Assembly | 07/07/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 84, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Assembly | 07/07/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2014 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2014 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4145.) | ||
Senate | 06/24/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2014 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2014 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4967.) | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2014 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2014 | Introduced. To print. |