California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR134 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/07/2014

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 134CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 84 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 7, 2014 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 26, 2014 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 15, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Linder (Coauthors: Assembly Members Brown, Medina, and Nestande) (Coauthor: Senator Roth) APRIL 10, 2014 Relative to the Officer Michael Crain Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 134, Linder. Officer Michael Crain Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 91, in the County of Riverside, as the Officer Michael Crain Memorial Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost for appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Riverside Police Officer Michael (Mike) Crain was born in Anaheim, California, to Stephen and Cindy Crain, on April 9, 1978, and was the oldest of three children born to the Crain's, including a brother, Jason, and a sister, Leslie; and WHEREAS, Mike was raised in the Riverside, California, area and graduated from Redlands High School in 1996, after which he attended Crafton Hills College in Yucaipa, California, for a year prior to enlisting in the United States Marine Corps; and WHEREAS, During his military service, Mike served two deployment tours in Kuwait as a rifleman in the 15th Marine Expeditionary Unit, 3rd Battalion, 1st Marine Division, serving as a squad leader and being promoted to the rank of Sergeant, and was stationed at Camp Pendleton in Oceanside, California, where he taught Military Operations in Urban Terrain; and WHEREAS, Sergeant Crain was awarded the Good Conduct Medal, the Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal, the Sea Service Deployment Ribbon with one star, a Certificate of Commendation, and the Rifle Marksmanship Badge; and WHEREAS, After being honorably discharged from the Marine Corps, Mike graduated from the Riverside Sheriff's Academy, Class #152, and was sworn in as a Riverside Police Officer on August 24, 2001; and WHEREAS, Following his graduation from the Field Training Program, Officer Crain was assigned to Field Operations as a Patrol Officer. During his 11-year tenure with the Riverside Police Department, he served as a Patrol Officer and was assigned to the Special Weapons and Tactics (SWAT) Team; and WHEREAS, Officer Crain also served as a Helicopter Observer, a Field Training Officer, a Firearms Instructor, and was assigned to the University Neighborhood Enhancement Team (UNET); and WHEREAS, During the early morning of February 7, 2013, Officer Crain was gunned down in an apparent ambush while he was on patrol and parked at a stoplight with a trainee officer; and WHEREAS, Mike had a big heart, and his family and friends knew his usually straight face hid a huge personality. He enjoyed spending time with his wife, Regina, his son, Ian, age 10, and their daughter Kaitlyn, age 4. He loved attending dance recitals with his daughter and coaching his son's baseball team. He also loved his classic 1970 Chevy Nova, which he spent his spare time restoring; and WHEREAS, Mike made an unforgettable impression on everyone he met and he is missed by his family, friends, and his community; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the 4.7 mile portion of State Highway Route 91 between La Sierra Avenue and Madison Street in the County of Riverside as the Officer Michael Crain Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of erecting the appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.