Assembly
|
09/02/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Page 6106.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 4500.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 3. Page 4754.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|