LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR67
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR67
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR67
Compare Versions
ACR67 Chaptered September 2, 2014
ACR67 Enrolled August 20, 2014
ACR67 Amended June 25, 2014
ACR67 Amended March 12, 2014
ACR67 Introduced June 24, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
ACR67 Chaptered September 2, 2014
ACR67 Enrolled August 20, 2014
ACR67 Amended June 25, 2014
ACR67 Amended March 12, 2014
ACR67 Introduced June 24, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare