LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR68
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR68
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR68
Compare Versions
ACR68 Chaptered September 27, 2013
ACR68 Enrolled September 18, 2013
ACR68 Amended August 5, 2013
ACR68 Amended July 2, 2013
ACR68 Introduced June 25, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
ACR68 Chaptered September 27, 2013
ACR68 Enrolled September 18, 2013
ACR68 Amended August 5, 2013
ACR68 Amended July 2, 2013
ACR68 Introduced June 25, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare