BILL NUMBER: ACR 68CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 142 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 27, 2013 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 11, 2013 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 26, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 5, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 2, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Donnelly (Coauthors: Assembly Members Hagman, Morrell, and Nestande) (Coauthors: Senators Emmerson and Knight) JUNE 25, 2013 Relative to the Detective Jeremiah MacKay Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 68, Donnelly. Detective Jeremiah MacKay Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a portion of State Highway Route 38 in San Bernardino County as the Detective Jeremiah MacKay Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Jeremiah MacKay was born on June 4, 1977, in San Bernardino, to Alan and Dawn MacKay; and WHEREAS, Mr. MacKay grew up with his younger sister, Angela, in Lake Arrowhead, where he developed a passion for mountain recreation. At the age of four he climbed the highest peak in southern California, 11,503-foot Mount San Gorgonio; and WHEREAS, Mr. MacKay attended Calvary Chapel Christian School in Twin Peaks, and Mary P. Jenck Intermediate School and Rim of the World High School, both in Lake Arrowhead; and WHEREAS, Throughout his adolescence, Mr. MacKay enjoyed being part of a youth group at Church of the Woods in Lake Arrowhead, and loved participating in sports, including football, tennis, and skiing; and WHEREAS, Mr. MacKay continued to spend time in the mountains as a young man, working as a ski and snowboard instructor at the Snow Valley Ski Resort in Running Springs, and as lake patrol for the Arrowhead Lake Association in Lake Arrowhead; and WHEREAS, Mr. MacKay began his career in public service when he joined the San Bernardino County Sheriff's Department as a member of Academy Class 131. He graduated from the program and became a Deputy Sheriff on June 4, 1998, his 21st birthday; and WHEREAS, As a deputy, Mr. MacKay was assigned to the Central Detention Center, Central Station, and Sheriff Training Facility, all in San Bernardino, and Twin Peaks station, in Twin Peaks. He was promoted to the rank of detective and served in that capacity at stations in Twin Peaks, Big Bear, and Yucaipa, with the radio call sign of 14.D.2; and WHEREAS, As part of the San Bernardino County Sheriff's Department, Detective MacKay earned five California Highway Patrol 10851 Awards and three Commander's Awards; and WHEREAS, Detective MacKay was chosen to be a member of the San Bernardino County Sheriff's Department Honor Guard, and lived by the three cardinal principles of the Sheriff's Department: honor, pride, and tradition; and WHEREAS, Although deeply committed to his public service career, family and friends always came first to Detective MacKay; and WHEREAS, Detective MacKay fell in love and proposed to his wife, Lynette, on Thanksgiving in 2010, and married her on November 19, 2011; and WHEREAS, Whenever he had the opportunity, Detective MacKay spent time with his family camping, attending country music concerts, and visiting the beach; and WHEREAS, Detective MacKay took pride in his Scottish heritage and enjoyed playing the bagpipes. He was a member of the Inland Empire Emerald Society for six years, and ultimately became the organization' s sergeant at arms; and WHEREAS, On February 12, 2013, at the age of 35, Detective MacKay was shot and killed by Christopher Dorner during the manhunt for the rogue ex-Los Angeles Police Department officer; and WHEREAS, Detective MacKay gave his life protecting the community that he treasured. He will be remembered as a family man with an infectious laugh who engaged life with joy and enthusiasm; and WHEREAS, Detective MacKay is survived by his beloved wife, Lynette, stepdaughter, Kaitlyn, and son, Cayden; and WHEREAS, To honor Detective MacKay's memory, the 14.D.2 Prayer Project has been established to encourage prayer for the safety of first responders; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 38 from post mile 24.00 to post mile 29.00, inclusive, in San Bernardino County as the Detective Jeremiah MacKay Memorial Highway to honor his noble sacrifice; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.