Assembly
|
09/27/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/27/2013
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2342.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2724.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|