BILL NUMBER: ACR 69CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 143 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 27, 2013 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 11, 2013 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 26, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 5, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Salas JUNE 26, 2013 Relative to the CHP Officer Dean Esquibel Memorial Bridge. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 69, Salas. CHP Officer Dean Esquibel Memorial Bridge. This measure would designate the Cross Creek Bridge in the County of Kings as the CHP Officer Dean Esquibel Memorial Bridge. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation, and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, CHP Officer Dean Jose Esquibel was born July 31, 1962, to Joan and Alex Esquibel, in Greensboro, North Carolina; and WHEREAS, Officer Esquibel graduated from Orosi High School in 1980, joined the Police Academy through the College of the Sequoias shortly thereafter, and was assigned to the Orange Cove Police Department upon graduation; and WHEREAS, Officer Esquibel worked as an Orange Cove Police Officer and did undercover work for the Dinuba Police Department prior to becoming a California Highway Patrol Officer; and WHEREAS, Officer Dean Esquibel married his best friend, Christine Lewis, on June 21, 1981, and had a wonderful son, Justin, born August 22, 1983; and WHEREAS, In his spare time, Officer Esquibel enjoyed fishing, bike riding, and spending time with his family; and WHEREAS, Officer Esquibel entered the Department of the California Highway Patrol Academy on April 2, 1984, and upon graduation was assigned to the Hanford Area Office, where he proudly served the department for approximately one year; and WHEREAS, Officer Esquibel, badge number 11289, while providing backup in a high-speed pursuit of a fleeing motorcyclist on State Route 198, was forced to veer off the road, causing his patrol car to burst into flames; and WHEREAS, The impact of the collision pinned Officer Esquibel inside his patrol car, and, although he was rescued by fellow CHP Officer De La Cruz shortly thereafter, Officer Esquibel succumbed to his injuries two weeks later on August 21, 1985; and WHEREAS, Officer Esquibel was a hardworking, dedicated officer who loved his job, enjoyed the people he worked with, and was known for being a loyal family man and a wonderful father and husband; and WHEREAS, He is survived by his wife and son who were his greatest joys; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Officer Esquibel's great contributions and sacrifice in serving the California Highway Patrol and the citizens of California, it would be fitting to designate the Cross Creek Bridge in the County of Kings in his honor; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the Cross Creek Bridge, Bridge No. 45-06, on State Route 198, in the County of Kings, as the CHP Officer Dean Esquibel Memorial Bridge; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of erecting the appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation, and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.