Assembly | 05/30/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2014 | Enrolled measure version corrected. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3535.) | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4479.) | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9). | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2014 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2014 | Introduced. To print. |