California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR98 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/30/2014

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 98CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 38 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 30, 2014 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 23, 2014 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bigelow (Coauthor: Assembly Member Wagner) (Coauthor: Senator Berryhill) FEBRUARY 14, 2014 Relative to State Route 132. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 98, Bigelow. State Highway Route 132: memorial plaque. This measure would authorize the placement of a permanent memorial plaque on State Highway Route 132, at the site where United States Secret Service Agents Donald W. Robinson, Donald A. Bejcek, and George P. LaBarge perished in a vehicle accident while on assignment to protect the life of Queen Elizabeth II. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of erecting the permanent memorial plaque and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect the plaque. WHEREAS, On March 5, 1983, United States Secret Service Special Agents Donald W. Robinson, Donald A. Bejcek, and George P. LaBarge were on official business while traveling in a vehicle from Merced, California, to Yosemite National Park; and WHEREAS, These special agents were en route to their assignment to protect the life of Queen Elizabeth II of the United Kingdom during her official visit to Yosemite Valley; and WHEREAS, Tragically all three of these special agents perished on that date in a vehicle accident while traveling on State Highway Route 132 in Mariposa County, California; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby authorizes the placement of a permanent memorial plaque on State Highway Route 132 at the site of the March 5, 1983, accident, which shall be located between highway marker 300, located west of the Jalapa Road eastbound lane, and highway marker 371 at the county line with Mariposa/Tuolumne eastbound lane; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of erecting a memorial plaque consistent with the requirements for the state highway system and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect the plaque; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.