Assembly | 07/07/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Assembly | 07/07/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2014 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5695.). | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2014 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2014 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 4021.) | ||
Senate | 06/18/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2014 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2014 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 4330.) | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 24). | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2014 | Introduced. To print. |