LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR39
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR39
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR39
Compare Versions
AJR39 Chaptered July 7, 2014
AJR39 Enrolled June 30, 2014
AJR39 Amended June 17, 2014
AJR39 Amended March 13, 2014
AJR39 Introduced February 19, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AJR39 Chaptered July 7, 2014
AJR39 Enrolled June 30, 2014
AJR39 Amended June 17, 2014
AJR39 Amended March 13, 2014
AJR39 Introduced February 19, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare