|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 556, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 4601.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6021.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5967.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3321.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3163.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2014
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|