California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1011 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 11, 2014
Bill June 26, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014