|
09/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 435, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4546.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6015.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5904.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3358.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3210.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|