California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1012 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2014

Amended

Bill August 7, 2014
Bill June 11, 2014
Bill June 9, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014