Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 3690.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3707.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3210.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2991.) (March 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2014
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|