California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1014 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2014

Amended

Bill August 6, 2014
Bill June 30, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill April 1, 2014