California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1019 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill June 30, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 24, 2014