LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1019
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1019
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1019
Compare Versions
SB1019 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB1019 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB1019 Amended August 22, 2014
SB1019 Amended August 18, 2014
SB1019 Amended June 30, 2014
SB1019 Amended June 18, 2014
SB1019 Amended June 10, 2014
SB1019 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1019 Amended April 21, 2014
SB1019 Amended March 24, 2014
SB1019 Introduced February 14, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1019 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB1019 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB1019 Amended August 22, 2014
SB1019 Amended August 18, 2014
SB1019 Amended June 30, 2014
SB1019 Amended June 18, 2014
SB1019 Amended June 10, 2014
SB1019 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1019 Amended April 21, 2014
SB1019 Amended March 24, 2014
SB1019 Introduced February 14, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare