California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB102 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 28, 2013
Bill August 27, 2013