LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB102
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB102
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB102
Compare Versions
SB102 Chaptered September 27, 2013
SB102 Enrolled September 11, 2013
SB102 Amended September 3, 2013
SB102 Amended August 28, 2013
SB102 Amended August 27, 2013
SB102 Introduced January 10, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB102 Chaptered September 27, 2013
SB102 Enrolled September 11, 2013
SB102 Amended September 3, 2013
SB102 Amended August 28, 2013
SB102 Amended August 27, 2013
SB102 Introduced January 10, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare