California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1022 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 16, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014