LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1022
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1022
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1022
Compare Versions
SB1022 Chaptered September 17, 2014
SB1022 Enrolled August 20, 2014
SB1022 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1022 Amended June 16, 2014
SB1022 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1022 Amended April 22, 2014
SB1022 Introduced February 14, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1022 Chaptered September 17, 2014
SB1022 Enrolled August 20, 2014
SB1022 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1022 Amended June 16, 2014
SB1022 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1022 Amended April 22, 2014
SB1022 Introduced February 14, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare