California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1023 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill June 19, 2014
Bill June 12, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 24, 2014
Bill April 3, 2014