LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1023
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1023
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1023
Compare Versions
SB1023 Chaptered September 29, 2014
SB1023 Enrolled August 21, 2014
SB1023 Amended June 19, 2014
SB1023 Amended June 12, 2014
SB1023 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1023 Amended April 24, 2014
SB1023 Amended April 3, 2014
SB1023 Introduced February 14, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1023 Chaptered September 29, 2014
SB1023 Enrolled August 21, 2014
SB1023 Amended June 19, 2014
SB1023 Amended June 12, 2014
SB1023 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1023 Amended April 24, 2014
SB1023 Amended April 3, 2014
SB1023 Introduced February 14, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare