|
09/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 319, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4546.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6047.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and HEALTH. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3535.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3503.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3343.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3211.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|