California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1039 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 15, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 26, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill June 5, 2014
Bill May 5, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014