|
07/07/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 4140.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5649.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5622.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3465.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3402.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|